1 | | - | H.B. No. 4120 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Lucio III (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 4120 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Business & Commerce; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with |
---|
| 5 | + | favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, |
---|
| 6 | + | Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4120 By: Menéndez |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the financial security requirement for providers |
---|
6 | 14 | | obligated under certain service contracts. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 1304.151, Occupations Code, is amended |
---|
9 | 17 | | by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (b-1), (b-2), and |
---|
10 | 18 | | (b-3) to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 19 | | (b) If the provider ensures its obligations under |
---|
12 | 20 | | Subsection (a)(2), the amount maintained in the reserve account may |
---|
13 | 21 | | not be less than an amount equal to 40 percent of the gross |
---|
14 | 22 | | consideration the provider received from consumers from the sale of |
---|
15 | 23 | | all service contracts issued and outstanding in this state, minus |
---|
16 | 24 | | any claims paid. The executive director may review and examine the |
---|
17 | 25 | | reserve account. Except as provided by Subsection (b-1), the [The] |
---|
18 | 26 | | amount of the security deposit may not be less than $250,000. The |
---|
19 | 27 | | provider must submit to the executive director on request a copy of |
---|
20 | 28 | | the provider's financial statements that must be prepared in |
---|
21 | 29 | | accordance with generally accepted accounting principles, be |
---|
22 | 30 | | without qualification as to the going concern status of the |
---|
23 | 31 | | provider, and be audited by an independent certified public |
---|
24 | 32 | | accountant. The commission by rule may require the provider to |
---|
25 | 33 | | submit additional financial reports. |
---|
26 | 34 | | (b-1) Subject to Subsection (b-2), the amount of the |
---|
27 | 35 | | security deposit required under Subsection (b) may not be less than |
---|
28 | 36 | | $25,000 if the provider: |
---|
29 | 37 | | (1) is a motor vehicle dealer licensed under Chapter |
---|
30 | 38 | | 2301; and |
---|
31 | 39 | | (2) offers to sell service contracts only on motor |
---|
32 | 40 | | vehicles sold by the provider. |
---|
33 | 41 | | (b-2) The amount of the security deposit required under |
---|
34 | 42 | | Subsection (b-1) is: |
---|
35 | 43 | | (1) $25,000 for a motor vehicle dealer that generated |
---|
36 | 44 | | $1,125,000 or less in annual gross revenue in this state from the |
---|
37 | 45 | | sale of service contracts in the preceding year; |
---|
38 | 46 | | (2) $50,000 for a motor vehicle dealer that generated |
---|
39 | 47 | | more than $1,125,000 and not more than $2,500,000 in annual gross |
---|
40 | 48 | | revenue in this state from the sale of service contracts in the |
---|
41 | 49 | | preceding year; and |
---|
42 | 50 | | (3) $75,000 for a motor vehicle dealer that generated |
---|
43 | 51 | | more than $2,500,000 in annual gross revenue in this state from the |
---|
44 | 52 | | sale of service contracts in the preceding year. |
---|
45 | 53 | | (b-3) If a motor vehicle dealer described by Subsection |
---|
46 | 54 | | (b-1) has no gross revenue in this state from the sale of service |
---|
47 | 55 | | contracts in the preceding year, the security deposit shall be |
---|
48 | 56 | | $25,000. |
---|
49 | 57 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
50 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
51 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
52 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4120 was passed by the House on April |
---|
53 | | - | 25, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 131, Nays 5, 1 present, not |
---|
54 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
55 | | - | No. 4120 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 3, |
---|
56 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
57 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
58 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
59 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4120 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
60 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
61 | | - | 0. |
---|
62 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
63 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
64 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
65 | | - | Date |
---|
66 | | - | __________________ |
---|
67 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 58 | + | * * * * * |
---|