Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4130 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 7, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 13, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2019
Bill May 1, 2019