Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4153 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/22/2019

                            86R20738 BRG-D
 By: Anchia, Zerwas, Rose, Schaefer, Longoria, H.B. No. 4153
 et al.
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 4153:
 By:  Longoria C.S.H.B. No. 4153


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the compensation and benefits of persons wrongfully
 imprisoned.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 103.001(d), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (d)  Subject to this section, a person entitled to
 compensation under Subsection (a) is also eligible to obtain group
 health benefit plan coverage through the Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice as if the person were an employee of the
 department.  The [This subsection does not entitle the] person's
 spouse and dependents may be included in the person's [or other
 dependent or family member to group health benefit plan] coverage
 as if the person were an employee of the department.  Coverage may
 be obtained under this subsection for a period of time equal to the
 total period the claimant served for the crime for which the
 claimant was wrongfully imprisoned, including any period during
 which the claimant was released on parole or to mandatory
 supervision or required to register under Chapter 62, Code of
 Criminal Procedure.  A person who elects to obtain coverage under
 this subsection shall pay a monthly contribution equal to the total
 amount of the monthly contributions for that coverage for an
 employee of the department.
 SECTION 2.  Section 103.0535, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended by amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection
 (d-1) to read as follows:
 (d)  An election under this section must be made not later
 than the 45th day after the date:
 (1)  on which the claimant files with the comptroller
 the application required by Section 103.051; or
 (2)  on which the claimant experiences one of the
 following life-changing events:
 (A)  a change in the employment status of the
 claimant or a spouse, dependent, or beneficiary of the claimant;
 (B)  marriage or divorce of the claimant;
 (C)  the addition of a dependent of the claimant;
 or
 (D)  the death of a dependent, spouse, or
 beneficiary of the claimant.
 (d-1)  An election under Subsection (d) must be made on a
 form prescribed by the comptroller that:
 (1)  identifies the claimant's spouse or designated
 beneficiary according to Section 103.0536; and
 (2)  specifies the option selected under Subsection
 (c).
 SECTION 3.  A person who, before the effective date of this
 Act, obtained group health benefit plan coverage under Section
 103.001(d), Civil Practice and Remedies Code, as the law existed
 before the effective date of this Act, may elect to include the
 person's spouse and dependents in the person's coverage as provided
 by Section 103.001(d), Civil Practice and Remedies Code, as amended
 by this Act.  An election under this section must be made:
 (1)  not later than March 1, 2020; or
 (2)  during any subsequent open enrollment period
 applicable to employees of the Texas Department of Criminal
 Justice.
 SECTION 4.  (a)  Notwithstanding Section 103.0535(d), Civil
 Practice and Remedies Code, as amended by this Act, a person
 entitled to compensation under Section 103.001(a), Civil Practice
 and Remedies Code, who started receiving annuity payments before
 the effective date of this Act may elect to receive any remaining
 payments as alternative annuity payments under Section 103.0535,
 Civil Practice and Remedies Code, as amended by this Act, by filing
 the form described by Section 103.0535(d-1), Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code, as added by this Act, with the comptroller after
 December 31, 2019, and before March 1, 2020. The value of
 alternative annuity payments elected under this subsection must be
 actuarially equivalent to the remaining value of the annuity
 payments the person would receive absent the election.  This
 subsection does not affect the ability of a person described by this
 subsection to make an election under Section 103.0535(d), Civil
 Practice and Remedies Code, as amended by this Act, following a
 life-changing event described by that subsection.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2019, the comptroller shall
 provide notice to all persons entitled to compensation under
 Section 103.001(a), Civil Practice and Remedies Code, of:
 (1)  the opportunity described by Subsection (a) of
 this section to elect to receive alternative annuity payments under
 Section 103.0535, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, as amended by
 this Act;
 (2)  the opportunity to elect to receive alternative
 annuity payments after a life-changing event under Section
 103.0535(d), Civil Practice and Remedies Code, as amended by this
 Act; and
 (3)  the opportunity to obtain group health benefit
 plan coverage for a spouse or dependent under Section 103.001(d),
 Civil Practice and Remedies Code, as amended by this Act.
 (c)  The comptroller shall provide the notice required by
 Subsection (b) of this section by:
 (1)  certified mail to a person's last known address;
 and
 (2)  phone call to the phone number that the
 comptroller has on file for the person.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.