Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4158 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 10, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2019
Bill May 1, 2019