H.B. No. 4166 AN ACT relating to a study of the feasibility of the expansion of navigation on the Red River by the Red River Authority of Texas. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. (a) The Red River Authority of Texas shall study the feasibility of increasing navigation on the Red River between Texarkana and Denison by completing the navigation system of locks and dams or other means. (b) Not later than January 1, 2021, the Red River Authority of Texas shall submit to the standing committees of the legislature having jurisdiction over navigation a report on the findings of the study. (c) This section expires January 2, 2021. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 4166 was passed by the House on April 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 3, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 4166 was passed by the Senate on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: _____________________ Date _____________________ Governor