Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | H.B. No. 4166 | |
1 | + | By: VanDeaver (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 4166 | |
2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019; | |
3 | + | April 30, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Water & | |
4 | + | Rural Affairs; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following | |
5 | + | vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.) | |
6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote | |
2 | 7 | ||
3 | 8 | ||
9 | + | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED | |
4 | 10 | AN ACT | |
5 | 11 | relating to a study of the feasibility of the expansion of | |
6 | 12 | navigation on the Red River by the Red River Authority of Texas. | |
7 | 13 | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: | |
8 | 14 | SECTION 1. (a) The Red River Authority of Texas shall study | |
9 | 15 | the feasibility of increasing navigation on the Red River between | |
10 | 16 | Texarkana and Denison by completing the navigation system of locks | |
11 | 17 | and dams or other means. | |
12 | 18 | (b) Not later than January 1, 2021, the Red River Authority | |
13 | 19 | of Texas shall submit to the standing committees of the legislature | |
14 | 20 | having jurisdiction over navigation a report on the findings of the | |
15 | 21 | study. | |
16 | 22 | (c) This section expires January 2, 2021. | |
17 | 23 | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. | |
18 | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ | |
19 | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House | |
20 | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4166 was passed by the House on April | |
21 | - | 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 3, 2 present, not | |
22 | - | voting. | |
23 | - | ______________________________ | |
24 | - | Chief Clerk of the House | |
25 | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4166 was passed by the Senate on May | |
26 | - | 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. | |
27 | - | ______________________________ | |
28 | - | Secretary of the Senate | |
29 | - | APPROVED: _____________________ | |
30 | - | Date | |
31 | - | _____________________ | |
32 | - | Governor | |
24 | + | * * * * * |