Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4179 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 7, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2019
Bill April 29, 2019