Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4209 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/12/2019

                            By: Davis of Dallas H.B. No. 4209


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the election of members of the governing body of an
 open-enrollment charter school.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 12.111(a), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Each charter granted under this subchapter must:
 (1)  describe the educational program to be offered,
 which must include the required curriculum as provided by Section
 28.002;
 (2)  provide that continuation of the charter is
 contingent on the status of the charter as determined under Section
 12.1141 or 12.115 or under Chapter 39A;
 (3)  specify the academic, operational, and financial
 performance expectations by which a school operating under the
 charter will be evaluated, which must include applicable elements
 of the performance frameworks adopted under Section 12.1181;
 (4)  specify:
 (A)  any basis, in addition to a basis specified
 by this subchapter or Chapter 39A, on which the charter may be
 revoked, renewal of the charter may be denied, or the charter may be
 allowed to expire; and
 (B)  the standards for evaluation of a school
 operating under the charter for purposes of charter renewal, denial
 of renewal, expiration, revocation, or other intervention in
 accordance with Section 12.1141 or 12.115 or Chapter 39A, as
 applicable;
 (5)  prohibit discrimination in admission policy on the
 basis of sex, national origin, ethnicity, religion, disability,
 academic, artistic, or athletic ability, or the district the child
 would otherwise attend in accordance with this code, although the
 charter may:
 (A)  provide for the exclusion of a student who
 has a documented history of a criminal offense, a juvenile court
 adjudication, or discipline problems under Subchapter A, Chapter
 37; and
 (B)  provide for an admission policy that requires
 a student to demonstrate artistic ability if the school specializes
 in performing arts;
 (6)  specify the grade levels to be offered;
 (7)  describe the governing structure of the program,
 including:
 (A)  the officer positions designated;
 (B)  the manner in which officers are selected and
 removed from office;
 (C)  the manner in which temporary members of the
 governing body of the school are selected;
 (D)  the manner in which members of the governing
 body to be elected as required by this subchapter;
 (E)  the manner in which elected members of the
 governing body are [and] removed from office;
 (F) [(D)]  the manner in which vacancies for
 elected members on that governing body are filled;
 (G) [(E)]  the term for which elected members of
 that governing body serve, provided that the term does not exceed
 four years; and
 (H) [(F)]  whether the terms are to be staggered;
 (8)  specify the powers or duties of the governing body
 of the school that the governing body may delegate to an officer;
 (9)  specify the manner in which the school will
 distribute to parents information related to the qualifications of
 each professional employee of the program, including any
 professional or educational degree held by each employee, a
 statement of any certification under Subchapter B, Chapter 21, held
 by each employee, and any relevant experience of each employee;
 (10)  describe the process by which the person
 providing the program will adopt an annual budget;
 (11)  describe the manner in which an annual audit of
 the financial and programmatic operations of the program is to be
 conducted, including the manner in which the person providing the
 program will provide information necessary for the school district
 in which the program is located to participate, as required by this
 code or by commissioner rule, in the Public Education Information
 Management System (PEIMS);
 (12)  describe the facilities to be used;
 (13)  describe the geographical area served by the
 program;
 (14)  specify any type of enrollment criteria to be
 used;
 (15)  provide information, as determined by the
 commissioner, relating to any management company that will provide
 management services to a school operating under the charter; and
 (16)  specify that the governing body of an
 open-enrollment charter school accepts and may not delegate
 ultimate responsibility for the school, including the school's
 academic performance and financial and operational viability, and
 is responsible for overseeing any management company providing
 management services for the school and for holding the management
 company accountable for the school's performance.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 12, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 12.1135 and 12.1136 to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.1135.  ELECTION OF CERTAIN MEMBERS OF GOVERNING
 BODY. (a) Not later than one school year after an open-enrollment
 charter school begins providing instruction to students, the
 temporary members of the governing body of the school shall, in the
 manner prescribed by the charter, hold an election to elect the
 members of the governing body.
 (b)  Each parent of or person standing in parental relation
 to a student enrolled at the school may vote in an election under
 this section, regardless of the disproportionate representation
 that may result.
 (c)  This section does not prohibit the election or selection
 of a temporary member.
 Sec. 12.1136.  ELECTION OF CERTAIN MEMBERS OF GOVERNING
 BODY: CHARTERS IN OPERATION ON SEPTEMBER 1, 2019. (a) This section
 applies to an open-enrollment charter school that:
 (1)  is in operation on September 1, 2019; and
 (2)  is not subject to alternative management or
 another sanction affecting its governance under this code.
 (b)  Not later than September 1, 2020, an open-enrollment
 charter school subject to this section shall:
 (1)  revise the school's charter to conform to the
 changes in law made by H.B. , 86th Legislature, Regular Session,
 2019; and
 (2)  in the manner prescribed by the charter, hold an
 election of the members of the governing body.
 (c)  Each parent of or person standing in parental relation
 to a student enrolled at the school may vote in an election under
 this section, regardless of the disproportionate representation
 that may result.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.