Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4211 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2019

                    By: Nevárez (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 4211
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019;
 April 30, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of State Highway Loop 480 in Maverick
 County as Loop JUNO.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.152 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.152.  LOOP JUNO. (a) State Highway Loop 480 in
 Maverick County is designated as Loop JUNO.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as Loop JUNO and any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the loop and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the loop.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *