1 | | - | H.B. No. 4258 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Murphy, Gervin-Hawkins H.B. No. 4258 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Campbell) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2019; |
---|
| 4 | + | May 14, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 5 | + | Education; May 17, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 6 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0, |
---|
| 7 | + | 1 present not voting; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4258 By: Watson |
---|
4 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 14 | | relating to review and approval by the attorney general of certain |
---|
6 | 15 | | bonds financing an educational facility for certain charter |
---|
7 | 16 | | schools. |
---|
8 | 17 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 18 | | SECTION 1. Section 53.40, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
10 | 19 | | adding Subsection (c) to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 20 | | (c) The attorney general has sole authority to review the |
---|
12 | 21 | | record of public notice and hearings relating to any bond financing |
---|
13 | 22 | | an educational facility for an authorized charter school, and the |
---|
14 | 23 | | attorney general may issue an approval as required by Section |
---|
15 | 24 | | 147(f), Internal Revenue Code of 1986. |
---|
16 | 25 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
17 | 26 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
18 | 27 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
19 | 28 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
20 | 29 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
21 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
22 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
23 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4258 was passed by the House on May |
---|
24 | | - | 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 88, Nays 43, 2 present, not |
---|
25 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
26 | | - | No. 4258 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 124, Nays 15, |
---|
27 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
28 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
29 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
30 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4258 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
31 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 21, Nays |
---|
32 | | - | 10. |
---|
33 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
34 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
35 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
36 | | - | Date |
---|
37 | | - | __________________ |
---|
38 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 30 | + | * * * * * |
---|