1 | | - | H.B. No. 4280 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Morrison, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Flores) H.B. No. 4280 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Transportation; May 13, 2019, reported favorably by the following |
---|
| 5 | + | vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 13, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to the grant program distributing money from the |
---|
6 | 12 | | transportation infrastructure fund. |
---|
7 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Sections 256.103(a) and (b), Transportation |
---|
9 | 15 | | Code, are amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 16 | | (a) The department shall develop policies and procedures to |
---|
11 | 17 | | administer a grant program under this subchapter to make grants to |
---|
12 | 18 | | counties only for transportation infrastructure projects located |
---|
13 | 19 | | in areas of the state affected by increased oil and gas |
---|
14 | 20 | | production. The department may adopt rules to implement this |
---|
15 | 21 | | subchapter. |
---|
16 | 22 | | (b) Grants distributed during a fiscal year must be |
---|
17 | 23 | | allocated among counties as follows: |
---|
18 | 24 | | (1) 10 [20] percent according to weight tolerance |
---|
19 | 25 | | permits, determined by the ratio of weight tolerance permits issued |
---|
20 | 26 | | in the preceding fiscal year for the county to the total number of |
---|
21 | 27 | | weight tolerance permits issued in the state in that fiscal year, as |
---|
22 | 28 | | determined by the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles; |
---|
23 | 29 | | (2) 20 percent according to oil and gas production |
---|
24 | 30 | | taxes, determined by the ratio of oil and gas production taxes |
---|
25 | 31 | | collected by the comptroller in the preceding fiscal year in the |
---|
26 | 32 | | county to the total amount of oil and gas production taxes collected |
---|
27 | 33 | | in the state in that fiscal year, as determined by the comptroller; |
---|
28 | 34 | | (3) 45 [50] percent according to horizontal well |
---|
29 | 35 | | completions, determined by the ratio of horizontal well completions |
---|
30 | 36 | | in the preceding fiscal year in the county to the total number of |
---|
31 | 37 | | horizontal well completions in the state in that fiscal year, as |
---|
32 | 38 | | determined by the Railroad Commission of Texas; [and] |
---|
33 | 39 | | (4) 10 percent according to the volume of oil and gas |
---|
34 | 40 | | waste injected, determined by the ratio of the volume of oil and gas |
---|
35 | 41 | | waste injected in the preceding fiscal year in the county to the |
---|
36 | 42 | | total volume of oil and gas waste injected in the state in that |
---|
37 | 43 | | fiscal year, as determined by the Railroad Commission of Texas; and |
---|
38 | 44 | | (5) 15 percent according to vertical well completions, |
---|
39 | 45 | | determined by the ratio of vertical well completions in the |
---|
40 | 46 | | preceding fiscal year in the county to the total number of vertical |
---|
41 | 47 | | well completions in the state in that fiscal year, as determined by |
---|
42 | 48 | | the Railroad Commission of Texas. |
---|
43 | | - | SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 256, Transportation Code, |
---|
| 49 | + | SECTION 2. Section 256.104(a), Transportation Code, is |
---|
| 50 | + | amended to read as follows: |
---|
| 51 | + | (a) In applying for a grant under this subchapter, the |
---|
| 52 | + | county shall: |
---|
| 53 | + | (1) provide the road condition report described by |
---|
| 54 | + | Section 251.018 made by the county for the previous year; and |
---|
| 55 | + | (2) submit to the department a plan that: |
---|
| 56 | + | (A) provides a list of transportation |
---|
| 57 | + | infrastructure projects to be funded by the grant; |
---|
| 58 | + | (B) describes the scope of the transportation |
---|
| 59 | + | infrastructure project or projects to be funded by the grant using |
---|
| 60 | + | best practices for prioritizing the projects; and |
---|
| 61 | + | (C) [provides for matching funds as required by |
---|
| 62 | + | Section 256.105; and |
---|
| 63 | + | [(D)] meets any other requirements imposed by the |
---|
| 64 | + | department. |
---|
| 65 | + | SECTION 3. Subchapter C, Chapter 256, Transportation Code, |
---|
44 | 66 | | is amended by adding Sections 256.107 and 256.108 to read as |
---|
45 | 67 | | follows: |
---|
46 | 68 | | Sec. 256.107. COMPETITIVE BIDDING REQUIRED FOR CONTRACTS |
---|
47 | 69 | | FUNDED BY GRANTS. (a) Except as otherwise provided by law, a county |
---|
48 | 70 | | that enters into a contract for a transportation infrastructure |
---|
49 | 71 | | project that involves construction or maintenance of roads and is |
---|
50 | 72 | | funded by a grant under this subchapter shall: |
---|
51 | 73 | | (1) advertise for bids for the contract in a manner |
---|
52 | 74 | | prescribed by law; |
---|
53 | 75 | | (2) receive competitive bids for the contract, |
---|
54 | 76 | | publicly open the bids, and read aloud the names of the bidders and |
---|
55 | 77 | | their bids; and |
---|
56 | 78 | | (3) award the contract to the lowest responsible |
---|
57 | 79 | | bidder. |
---|
58 | 80 | | (b) In advertising for bids under Subsection (a), a county |
---|
59 | 81 | | shall prepare a request for competitive bids that includes |
---|
60 | 82 | | construction documents, estimated budget, project scope, estimated |
---|
61 | 83 | | project completion date, and other information that a bidder may |
---|
62 | 84 | | require to submit a bid. |
---|
63 | 85 | | (c) Not later than the seventh day after the date a contract |
---|
77 | | - | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
78 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
79 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
80 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4280 was passed by the House on May 8, |
---|
81 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
82 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
83 | | - | No. 4280 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, |
---|
84 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
85 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
86 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
87 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4280 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
88 | | - | amendments, on May 20, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
89 | | - | 0. |
---|
90 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
91 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
92 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
93 | | - | Date |
---|
94 | | - | __________________ |
---|
95 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 100 | + | SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
| 101 | + | * * * * * |
---|