Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Record vote RV#926
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Amended 1-Schaefer
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(b)(4)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|