Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4298 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2019

                    By: Murr (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 4298
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2019;
 May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4298 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the licensing of satellite offices of outpatient
 chemical dependency care facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 464.003, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 464.003.  EXEMPTIONS. This subchapter does not apply
 to:
 (1)  a facility maintained or operated by the federal
 government;
 (2)  a facility directly operated by the state;
 (3)  a facility licensed by the department under
 Chapter 241, 243, 248, 466, or 577;
 (4)  an educational program for intoxicated drivers;
 (5)  the individual office of a private, licensed
 health care practitioner who personally renders private individual
 or group services within the scope of the practitioner's license
 and in the practitioner's office;
 (6)  an individual who personally provides counseling
 or support services to a person with a chemical dependency but does
 not offer or purport to offer a chemical dependency treatment
 program;
 (7)  a 12-step or similar self-help chemical dependency
 recovery program:
 (A)  that does not offer or purport to offer a
 chemical dependency treatment program;
 (B)  that does not charge program participants;
 and
 (C)  in which program participants may maintain
 anonymity; [or]
 (8)  a juvenile justice facility or juvenile justice
 program, as defined by Section 261.405, Family Code; or
 (9)  a satellite office or location in which the person
 providing services is operating under the supervision of a licensed
 outpatient care facility and the services delivered at the
 satellite site fall within the scope of the licensure of the
 outpatient care facility.
 SECTION 2.  The Department of State Health Services is
 required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If
 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the department may, but is not required to, implement a
 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *