1 | | - | H.B. No. 4298 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Murr (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 4298 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & |
---|
| 4 | + | Human Services; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 20, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4298 By: Perry |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the licensing of satellite offices of outpatient |
---|
6 | 14 | | chemical dependency care facilities. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 464.003, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
9 | 17 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | Sec. 464.003. EXEMPTIONS. This subchapter does not apply |
---|
11 | 19 | | to: |
---|
12 | 20 | | (1) a facility maintained or operated by the federal |
---|
13 | 21 | | government; |
---|
14 | 22 | | (2) a facility directly operated by the state; |
---|
15 | 23 | | (3) a facility licensed by the department under |
---|
16 | 24 | | Chapter 241, 243, 248, 466, or 577; |
---|
17 | 25 | | (4) an educational program for intoxicated drivers; |
---|
18 | 26 | | (5) the individual office of a private, licensed |
---|
19 | 27 | | health care practitioner who personally renders private individual |
---|
20 | 28 | | or group services within the scope of the practitioner's license |
---|
21 | 29 | | and in the practitioner's office; |
---|
22 | 30 | | (6) an individual who personally provides counseling |
---|
23 | 31 | | or support services to a person with a chemical dependency but does |
---|
24 | 32 | | not offer or purport to offer a chemical dependency treatment |
---|
25 | 33 | | program; |
---|
26 | 34 | | (7) a 12-step or similar self-help chemical dependency |
---|
27 | 35 | | recovery program: |
---|
28 | 36 | | (A) that does not offer or purport to offer a |
---|
29 | 37 | | chemical dependency treatment program; |
---|
30 | 38 | | (B) that does not charge program participants; |
---|
31 | 39 | | and |
---|
32 | 40 | | (C) in which program participants may maintain |
---|
33 | 41 | | anonymity; [or] |
---|
34 | 42 | | (8) a juvenile justice facility or juvenile justice |
---|
35 | 43 | | program, as defined by Section 261.405, Family Code; or |
---|
36 | 44 | | (9) a satellite office or location in which the person |
---|
37 | 45 | | providing services is operating under the supervision of a licensed |
---|
38 | 46 | | outpatient care facility and the services delivered at the |
---|
39 | 47 | | satellite site fall within the scope of the licensure of the |
---|
40 | 48 | | outpatient care facility. |
---|
41 | 49 | | SECTION 2. The Department of State Health Services is |
---|
42 | 50 | | required to implement a provision of this Act only if the |
---|
43 | 51 | | legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If |
---|
44 | 52 | | the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that |
---|
45 | 53 | | purpose, the department may, but is not required to, implement a |
---|
46 | 54 | | provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that |
---|
47 | 55 | | purpose. |
---|
48 | 56 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
49 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
50 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
51 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4298 was passed by the House on May 8, |
---|
52 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
53 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
54 | | - | No. 4298 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 1, |
---|
55 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
56 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
57 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
58 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4298 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
59 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
60 | | - | 0. |
---|
61 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
62 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
63 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
64 | | - | Date |
---|
65 | | - | __________________ |
---|
66 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 57 | + | * * * * * |
---|