Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Record vote RV#882
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Amended 1-Biedermann
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Amended 3-Nevárez
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Amended 2-Gutierrez
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Postponed 5/1/19 1:30 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Postponed 5/1/19 6:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|