House | 05/10/2019 | Point of order sustained Rule 8, Section 13(b) | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Motion withdrawn | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Motion to postpone | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/20/2019 | Referred to Elections | ||
House | 02/20/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 11/30/2018 | Filed |