Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4310 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2019

                    By: Dutton (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 4310
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2019;
 April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 17, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0;
 May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4310 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a school district's scope and sequence for subjects in
 the required curriculum for public school students.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 28.0027 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.0027.  DISTRICT CURRICULUM SCOPE AND SEQUENCE. (a)
 In adopting a recommended or designated scope and sequence for a
 subject in the required curriculum under Section 28.002(a) in a
 particular grade level, a school district shall ensure sufficient
 time is provided for teachers to teach and students to learn the
 essential knowledge and skills for that subject and grade level.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), a school district
 may not penalize a teacher who does not follow a recommended or
 designated scope and sequence for a subject in the required
 curriculum under Section 28.002(a) in a particular grade level
 based on the teacher's determination that the teacher's students
 need more or less time in a specific area to demonstrate proficiency
 in the essential knowledge and skills for that subject and grade
 level.
 (c)  A school district may take appropriate action with
 respect to a teacher for conduct described by Subsection (b) based
 on documented evidence of a deficiency in classroom instruction
 obtained through observation or substantiated and documented
 third-party information.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *