1 | | - | H.B. No. 4310 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Dutton (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 4310 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Education; May 17, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 17, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4310 By: Hughes |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to a school district's scope and sequence for subjects in |
---|
6 | 14 | | the required curriculum for public school students. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is |
---|
9 | 17 | | amended by adding Section 28.0027 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | Sec. 28.0027. DISTRICT CURRICULUM SCOPE AND SEQUENCE. (a) |
---|
11 | 19 | | In adopting a recommended or designated scope and sequence for a |
---|
12 | 20 | | subject in the required curriculum under Section 28.002(a) in a |
---|
13 | 21 | | particular grade level, a school district shall ensure sufficient |
---|
14 | 22 | | time is provided for teachers to teach and students to learn the |
---|
15 | 23 | | essential knowledge and skills for that subject and grade level. |
---|
16 | 24 | | (b) Except as provided by Subsection (c), a school district |
---|
17 | 25 | | may not penalize a teacher who does not follow a recommended or |
---|
18 | 26 | | designated scope and sequence for a subject in the required |
---|
19 | 27 | | curriculum under Section 28.002(a) in a particular grade level |
---|
20 | 28 | | based on the teacher's determination that the teacher's students |
---|
21 | 29 | | need more or less time in a specific area to demonstrate proficiency |
---|
22 | 30 | | in the essential knowledge and skills for that subject and grade |
---|
23 | 31 | | level. |
---|
24 | 32 | | (c) A school district may take appropriate action with |
---|
25 | 33 | | respect to a teacher for conduct described by Subsection (b) based |
---|
26 | 34 | | on documented evidence of a deficiency in classroom instruction |
---|
27 | 35 | | obtained through observation or substantiated and documented |
---|
28 | 36 | | third-party information. |
---|
29 | 37 | | SECTION 2. This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020 |
---|
30 | 38 | | school year. |
---|
31 | 39 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
32 | 40 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
33 | 41 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
34 | 42 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
35 | 43 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
36 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
37 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
38 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4310 was passed by the House on April |
---|
39 | | - | 25, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 128, Nays 1, 1 present, not |
---|
40 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
41 | | - | No. 4310 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 8, |
---|
42 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
43 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
44 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
45 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4310 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
46 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
47 | | - | 1. |
---|
48 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
49 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
50 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
51 | | - | Date |
---|
52 | | - | __________________ |
---|
53 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 44 | + | * * * * * |
---|