Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4350 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2019

                    By: Bohac (Senate Sponsor - Alvarado) H.B. No. 4350
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Water &
 Rural Affairs; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to public safety answering points operated by emergency
 communications districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 772.001, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subdivision (4-a) to read as follows:
 (4-a)  "Emergency services district" means an
 emergency services district created under Chapter 775.
 SECTION 2.  Section 772.112(b), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A public safety answering point may transmit emergency
 response requests to private safety entities, with the approval of
 the board and the consent of each participating jurisdiction and
 emergency services district serving the relevant area.  A
 participating jurisdiction's or emergency services district's
 consent may be withdrawn at any time.
 SECTION 3.  Section 772.212(b), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A public safety answering point may transmit emergency
 response requests to private safety entities, with the approval of
 the board and the consent of each [the] participating jurisdiction
 and emergency services district serving the relevant area.  A
 participating jurisdiction's or emergency services district's
 consent may be withdrawn at any time.
 SECTION 4.  Section 772.312(b), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A public safety answering point may transmit emergency
 response requests to private safety entities, with the approval of
 the board and the consent of each participating jurisdiction and
 emergency services district serving the relevant area.  A
 participating jurisdiction's or emergency services district's
 consent may be withdrawn at any time.
 SECTION 5.  Section 772.515(b), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A public safety answering point may transmit emergency
 response requests to private safety entities, with the approval of
 the board and the consent of each participating jurisdiction and
 emergency services district serving the relevant area.  A
 participating jurisdiction's or emergency services district's
 consent may be withdrawn at any time.
 SECTION 6.  Section 772.614(b), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A public safety answering point may transmit emergency
 response requests to private safety entities, with the [board's]
 approval of the board and the consent of each participating
 jurisdiction and emergency services district serving the relevant
 area.  A participating jurisdiction's or emergency services
 district's consent may be withdrawn at any time.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *