Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4366 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/08/2019

                            86R1427 GRM-D
 By: Allen H.B. No. 4366


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a sales and use tax exemption for school supplies
 purchased by certain teachers for a limited period.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 151, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 151.3271 to read as follows:
 Sec. 151.3271.  SCHOOL SUPPLIES PURCHASED BY TEACHERS BEFORE
 START OF SCHOOL. (a)  In this section, "school supply" has the
 meaning assigned by the Streamlined Sales and Use Tax Agreement
 adopted November 12, 2002, including all amendments made to the
 agreement on or before May 3, 2018.
 (b)  The sale or storage, use, or other consumption of a
 school supply is exempted from the taxes imposed by this chapter if
 the school supply is purchased:
 (1)  by a teacher employed by a public school district
 or open-enrollment charter school for use in that teacher's
 classroom, regardless of whether the teacher has been designated as
 an authorized agent of the district or school for purposes of
 Section 151.309; and
 (2)  during the period beginning at 12:01 a.m. on the
 third Friday of July and ending at 11:59 p.m. on the following
 Sunday.
 (c)  The comptroller by rule shall provide a method for a
 retailer to determine a purchaser's eligibility for the exemption
 under this section.  A retailer is not required to obtain an
 exemption certificate from a purchaser determined eligible for the
 exemption as provided by comptroller rule unless the person
 purchases school supplies in a quantity that indicates that the
 school supplies are not purchased for use in a single teacher's
 classroom.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 31, 2019, the
 comptroller shall adopt rules necessary to implement Section
 151.3271, Tax Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act do not affect
 tax liability accruing before the effective date of this Act. That
 liability continues in effect as if this Act had not been enacted,
 and the former law is continued in effect for the collection of
 taxes due and for civil and criminal enforcement of the liability
 for those taxes.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.