Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4388 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 7, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2019
Bill April 25, 2019