House
|
05/08/2019
|
Record vote RV#1133
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Failed to pass
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Amended 1-Springer
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Postponed 5/8/19 12:05 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Record vote RV#1086
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Record vote RV#1085
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Amendment fails of adoption 1-Cain and Canales
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Point of order overruled Rule 8, Section 1(c)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Postponed 5/7/19 6:14 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Postponed 5/7/19 5:30 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 1(c)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2019
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|