Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB446 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 9, 2019
Bill March 19, 2019