12 | | - | SECTION 1. (a) In this section: |
---|
13 | | - | (1) "Blockchain" includes digital assets, virtual |
---|
14 | | - | currency, and the integration of smart contracts. |
---|
15 | | - | (2) "Work group" means the work group on blockchain |
---|
16 | | - | matters established under this section. |
---|
17 | | - | (b) The work group on blockchain matters is composed of the |
---|
18 | | - | following 14 members: |
---|
19 | | - | (1) one member of the house of representatives |
---|
20 | | - | appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives; |
---|
21 | | - | (2) one member of the senate appointed by the |
---|
22 | | - | lieutenant governor; |
---|
23 | | - | (3) two members representing institutions of higher |
---|
24 | | - | education appointed by the governor; and |
---|
25 | | - | (4) 10 members of the public, five of whom are |
---|
26 | | - | appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives and five of |
---|
27 | | - | whom are appointed by the lieutenant governor, who: |
---|
28 | | - | (A) have knowledge and experience in blockchain |
---|
29 | | - | technology; or |
---|
30 | | - | (B) represent an industry that would benefit from |
---|
31 | | - | the use of blockchain technology. |
---|
32 | | - | (c) The governor shall designate a member of the work group |
---|
33 | | - | appointed under Subsection (b)(3) of this section to serve as chair |
---|
34 | | - | of the work group. The members of the work group appointed under |
---|
35 | | - | Subsections (b)(1) and (2) of this section shall serve as co-vice |
---|
36 | | - | chairs of the work group. |
---|
37 | | - | (d) A member of the work group may not receive compensation |
---|
38 | | - | for serving on the work group or reimbursement for expenses |
---|
39 | | - | incurred by the member in the performance of official duties as a |
---|
40 | | - | member of the work group. |
---|
41 | | - | (e) The work group shall meet at the call of the chair. |
---|
42 | | - | (f) The work group shall develop a master plan for the |
---|
43 | | - | expansion of the blockchain industry in this state and recommend |
---|
44 | | - | policies and state investments in connection with blockchain |
---|
45 | | - | technology. In developing the master plan, the work group shall: |
---|
46 | | - | (1) identify economic growth and development |
---|
47 | | - | opportunities presented by blockchain technology; |
---|
48 | | - | (2) assess the existing blockchain industry in this |
---|
49 | | - | state; |
---|
50 | | - | (3) review workforce needs and academic programs |
---|
51 | | - | required to build blockchain expertise across all relevant |
---|
52 | | - | industries; and |
---|
53 | | - | (4) make any legislative recommendations that will |
---|
54 | | - | help promote innovation and economic growth by reducing barriers to |
---|
55 | | - | and expediting the expansion of the state's blockchain industry |
---|
56 | | - | based on its findings under Subdivisions (1)-(3) of this |
---|
57 | | - | subsection. |
---|
58 | | - | (g) Not later than November 1, 2020, the work group shall |
---|
59 | | - | submit a report that includes the master plan developed under |
---|
60 | | - | Subsection (f) of this section to each standing committee of the |
---|
61 | | - | senate and house of representatives with primary jurisdiction over |
---|
62 | | - | economic development or technology issues. |
---|
63 | | - | (h) The work group may adopt rules, procedures, and policies |
---|
64 | | - | as necessary to administer this section and implement the |
---|
65 | | - | responsibilities of the work group. |
---|
66 | | - | (i) This section expires and the work group is abolished |
---|
67 | | - | June 30, 2021. |
---|
68 | | - | SECTION 2. As soon as practicable, but not later than |
---|
69 | | - | October 1, 2019, the governor, lieutenant governor, and the speaker |
---|
70 | | - | of the house of representatives shall appoint the members of the |
---|
71 | | - | work group on blockchain matters established by this Act. |
---|
72 | | - | SECTION 3. Not later than November 1, 2019, the work group |
---|
73 | | - | on blockchain matters shall hold its initial meeting. |
---|
74 | | - | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
| 9 | + | Whereas, blockchain technology is a critically important |
---|
| 10 | + | development in commerce and finance, and in recognition of the |
---|
| 11 | + | importance of Texas as a center of technology and commerce, the |
---|
| 12 | + | Legislature deems it important to the future of this State to |
---|
| 13 | + | develop and recommend policies for the blockchain industry and to |
---|
| 14 | + | create appropriate legal infrastructure for transactions based |
---|
| 15 | + | upon blockchain, including digital assets and virtual currencies; |
---|
| 16 | + | and |
---|
| 17 | + | Whereas, to further the blockchain industry and to develop |
---|
| 18 | + | appropriate legislation for transactions using blockchain, |
---|
| 19 | + | including but not limited to, digital assets, virtual currency, and |
---|
| 20 | + | the integration of smart contracts, the Legislature desires to |
---|
| 21 | + | establish a working group to develop a master plan for expansion of |
---|
| 22 | + | the blockchain industry, Therefore, |
---|
| 23 | + | Section |
---|
| 24 | + | 1. There is established a working group to develop a |
---|
| 25 | + | master plan for fostering the expansion of the blockchain industry |
---|
| 26 | + | in the state and recommend policies and state investments to make |
---|
| 27 | + | Texas a leader in blockchain technology. Such a master plan shall: |
---|
| 28 | + | (1) Identify the economic growth and development opportunities |
---|
| 29 | + | presented by blockchain technology; (2) assess the existing |
---|
| 30 | + | blockchain industry in the state; (3) review workforce needs and |
---|
| 31 | + | academic programs required to build blockchain expertise across all |
---|
| 32 | + | relevant industries; and (4) make legislative recommendations that |
---|
| 33 | + | will help promote innovation and economic growth by reducing |
---|
| 34 | + | barriers to and expediting the expansion of the state's blockchain |
---|
| 35 | + | industry. |
---|
| 36 | + | (b) Appointments to the working group shall include, but |
---|
| 37 | + | need not be limited to, (1) not fewer than ten public members who |
---|
| 38 | + | have knowledge and experience in blockchain technology or represent |
---|
| 39 | + | an industry that could benefit from blockchain technology, and (2) |
---|
| 40 | + | not fewer than two members representing institutions of higher |
---|
| 41 | + | education in the state. All appointments to the working group shall |
---|
| 42 | + | be made not later than thirty days after the enactment of this |
---|
| 43 | + | legislation |
---|
| 44 | + | (c) The work group shall be co-chaired by a member of the |
---|
| 45 | + | House appointed by the Speaker of the House and a member of the |
---|
| 46 | + | Senate appointed by the Lieutenant Governor and by a public member |
---|
| 47 | + | appointed by the Governor who shall serve as Chair. The Speaker of |
---|
| 48 | + | the House shall appoint five public members and the Lt. Governor |
---|
| 49 | + | shall appoint 5 public members. The Governor shall appoint the |
---|
| 50 | + | members representing institutions of higher education. The |
---|
| 51 | + | chairperson shall schedule the first meeting of the working group, |
---|
| 52 | + | which shall be held not later than November 1, 2019. The working |
---|
| 53 | + | group shall meet at such other times as the chairperson deems |
---|
| 54 | + | necessary. |
---|
| 55 | + | (d) Not later than December 1, 2020, the working group shall |
---|
| 56 | + | submit a report on its findings and recommendations to the |
---|
| 57 | + | Legislature. |
---|
| 58 | + | Section 2. This Act takes effect on September 1, 2019. |
---|