Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4542 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/27/2019

                            H.B. No. 4542


 AN ACT
 relating to reports by persons involved in the manufacture and
 distribution of alcoholic beverages for purposes of sales and use
 taxes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 111, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 111.0023 to read as follows:
 Sec. 111.0023.  Definition of Individual. For purposes of
 this title, "individual" means a natural person. The term does not
 include a partnership, limited liability partnership, corporation,
 banking corporation, savings and loan association, limited
 liability company, business trust, professional association,
 business association, joint venture, joint stock company, holding
 company, or other legal entity.
 SECTION 2.  Section 111.006, Tax Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (h) and adding Subsection (j) to read as
 follows:
 (h)  The comptroller shall disclose information to a person
 regarding net sales by quantity, brand, and size that is submitted
 in a report required under Section 151.462 if:
 (1)  the person requesting the information holds a
 permit or license under Chapter 19, 20, 21, 37, 64, 65, or 66,
 Alcoholic Beverage Code; [and]
 (2)  the request relates only to information regarding
 the sale of a product distributed by the person making the request;
 and
 (3)  the comptroller determines that the information
 reported under Section 151.462 or in accordance with rules adopted
 under Subsection (j) is sufficiently detailed to protect the
 confidentiality of sales information relating to products not
 distributed by the person requesting the information.
 (j)  The comptroller may adopt rules to administer this
 section, including rules requiring a person requesting information
 under Subsection (h) to file reports on distributions of the
 person's products made to other persons.
 SECTION 3.  Section 151.461, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subdivision (1-a) and amending Subdivision (5) to read as follows:
 (1-a)  "Brewpub" means a brewpub for which a person
 holds a brewpub license under Chapter 74, Alcoholic Beverage Code.
 (5)  "Retailer" means a person required to hold:
 (A)  a wine and beer retailer's permit under
 Chapter 25, Alcoholic Beverage Code;
 (B)  a wine and beer retailer's off-premise permit
 under Chapter 26, Alcoholic Beverage Code;
 (C)  a temporary wine and beer retailer's permit
 or special three-day wine and beer permit under Chapter 27,
 Alcoholic Beverage Code;
 (D)  a mixed beverage permit under Chapter 28,
 Alcoholic Beverage Code;
 (E)  a daily temporary mixed beverage permit under
 Chapter 30, Alcoholic Beverage Code;
 (F)  a private club registration permit under
 Chapter 32, Alcoholic Beverage Code;
 (G)  a certificate issued to a fraternal or
 veterans organization under Section 32.11, Alcoholic Beverage
 Code;
 (H)  a daily temporary private club permit under
 Subchapter B, Chapter 33, Alcoholic Beverage Code;
 (I)  a temporary auction permit under Chapter 53,
 Alcoholic Beverage Code;
 (J)  a retail dealer's on-premise license under
 Chapter 69, Alcoholic Beverage Code;
 (K)  a temporary license under Chapter 72,
 Alcoholic Beverage Code; [or]
 (L)  a retail dealer's off-premise license under
 Chapter 71, Alcoholic Beverage Code, except for a dealer who also
 holds a package store permit under Chapter 22, Alcoholic Beverage
 Code; or
 (M)  a brewpub license under Chapter 74, Alcoholic
 Beverage Code.
 SECTION 4.  Section 151.462, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 151.462.  REPORTS BY BREWERS, MANUFACTURERS, BREWPUBS,
 WHOLESALERS, AND DISTRIBUTORS. (a) The comptroller shall require
 each brewer, manufacturer, brewpub, wholesaler, distributor, or
 package store local distributor to file with the comptroller a
 report each month of alcoholic beverage sales to retailers in this
 state.
 (b)  Each brewer, manufacturer, brewpub, wholesaler,
 distributor, or package store local distributor shall file a
 separate report for each permit or license held on or before the
 25th day of each month. The report must contain the following
 information for the preceding calendar month's sales in relation to
 each retailer:
 (1)  the brewer's, manufacturer's, brewpub's,
 wholesaler's, distributor's, or package store local distributor's
 name, address, taxpayer number and outlet number assigned by the
 comptroller, and alphanumeric permit or license number issued by
 the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission;
 (2)  the retailer's:
 (A)  name and address, including street name and
 number, city, and zip code;
 (B)  taxpayer number assigned by the comptroller;
 and
 (C)  alphanumeric permit or license number issued
 by the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission for each separate retail
 location or outlet to which the brewer, manufacturer, brewpub,
 wholesaler, distributor, or package store local distributor sold
 the alcoholic beverages that are listed on the report; and
 (3)  the monthly net sales made by the brewer,
 manufacturer, brewpub, wholesaler, distributor, or package store
 local distributor to the retailer for each outlet or location
 covered by a separate retail permit or license issued by the Texas
 Alcoholic Beverage Commission, including separate line items for:
 (A)  the number of units of alcoholic beverages;
 (B)  the individual container size and pack of
 each unit;
 (C)  the brand name;
 (D)  the type of beverage, such as distilled
 spirits, wine, or malt beverage;
 (E)  the universal product code of the alcoholic
 beverage; and
 (F)  the net selling price of the alcoholic
 beverage.
 (c)  Except as provided by this subsection, the brewer,
 manufacturer, brewpub, wholesaler, distributor, or package store
 local distributor shall file the report with the comptroller
 electronically. The comptroller may establish procedures to
 temporarily postpone the electronic reporting requirement for a
 brewer, manufacturer, brewpub, wholesaler, distributor, or package
 store local distributor who demonstrates to the comptroller an
 inability to comply because undue hardship would result if it were
 required to file the return electronically. If the comptroller
 determines that another technological method of filing the report
 is more efficient than electronic filing, the comptroller may
 establish procedures requiring its use by brewers, manufacturers,
 brewpubs, wholesalers, distributors, and package store local
 distributors.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter I-1, Chapter 151, Tax Code, is
 amended by adding Section 151.4661 to read as follows:
 Sec. 151.4661.  APPLICABILITY TO CERTAIN BREWPUBS. This
 subchapter applies only to a brewpub that engages in activities
 authorized by Section 74.08, Alcoholic Beverage Code.
 SECTION 6.  Section 151.468(b), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (b)  In addition to the penalties imposed under Subsection
 (a), a brewer, manufacturer, brewpub, wholesaler, distributor, or
 package store local distributor shall pay the state a civil penalty
 of not less than $25 or more than $2,000 for each day a violation
 continues if the brewer, manufacturer, brewpub, wholesaler,
 distributor, or package store local distributor:
 (1)  violates this subchapter; or
 (2)  violates a rule adopted to administer or enforce
 this subchapter.
 SECTION 7.  Section 151.470, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 151.470.  AUDIT; INSPECTION. The comptroller may
 audit, inspect, or otherwise verify a brewer's, manufacturer's,
 brewpub's, wholesaler's, distributor's, or package store local
 distributor's compliance with this subchapter.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4542 was passed by the House on May 7,
 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 141, Nays 5, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 4542 on May 23, 2019, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 4542 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 140,
 Nays 2, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4542 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 4542 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor