Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB455 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 455
1+By: Allen, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 455
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2019;
3+ April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Education; May 14, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
5+ Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 14, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to policies on the recess period in public schools.
612 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
713 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
814 amended by adding Sections 28.0047 and 28.0048 to read as follows:
915 Sec. 28.0047. MODEL RECESS POLICIES. The Department of
1016 State Health Services School Health Advisory Committee established
1117 under Section 1001.0711, Health and Safety Code, shall develop
1218 model policies for the recess period during the school day that
1319 encourage constructive, age-appropriate outdoor playtime. The
1420 model policies must include guidelines for outdoor equipment and
1521 facilities on public school campuses that maximize the
1622 effectiveness of outdoor physical activity.
1723 Sec. 28.0048. RECESS POLICY. (a) The board of trustees of
1824 each school district shall:
1925 (1) after reviewing the model recess policies
2026 developed under Section 28.0047 and the policy recommendations of
2127 the local school health advisory council provided under Section
2228 28.004(l), adopt a recess policy based on those model policies and
2329 recommendations; and
2430 (2) review and, if necessary, revise the recess policy
2531 at least every five years.
2632 (b) The recess policy must specify:
2733 (1) the required number of minutes of weekly
2834 unstructured playtime; and
2935 (2) whether a student's recess time may be withheld as
3036 a form of student discipline.
3137 (c) Each school district campus subject to the district
3238 recess policy adopted under Subsection (a) shall implement the
3339 recess policy.
3440 SECTION 2. (a) Not later than January 1, 2020, the
3541 Department of State Health Services School Health Advisory
3642 Committee shall develop model recess policies as required by
3743 Section 28.0047, Education Code, as added by this Act.
3844 (b) Not later than May 1, 2020, the board of trustees of each
3945 school district shall adopt a recess policy as required by Section
4046 28.0048, Education Code, as added by this Act.
4147 (c) Not later than the beginning of the 2020-2021 school
4248 year, each school district campus subject to a school district
4349 recess policy adopted under Section 28.0048, Education Code, as
4450 added by this Act, shall implement the adopted policy.
4551 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
4652 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
4753 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
4854 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
4955 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
50- ______________________________ ______________________________
51- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
52- I certify that H.B. No. 455 was passed by the House on April
53- 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 95, Nays 48, 2 present, not
54- voting.
55- ______________________________
56- Chief Clerk of the House
57- I certify that H.B. No. 455 was passed by the Senate on May
58- 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3.
59- ______________________________
60- Secretary of the Senate
61- APPROVED: _____________________
62- Date
63- _____________________
64- Governor
56+ * * * * *