House | 04/16/2019 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Referred to Natural Resources | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/14/2019 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 03/11/2019 | Filed |