Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4636 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2019
Bill April 24, 2019