Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Record vote RV#962
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2019
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2019
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|