Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4689 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 29, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 10, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2019
Bill May 4, 2019