Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4712 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/27/2019

                    H.B. No. 4712


 AN ACT
 relating to the powers and duties of the Fort Bend County Levee
 Improvement District No. 7.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 7808.001(3), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (3)  "Reuse project [Project]" means a facility,
 improvement, appliance, appurtenance, land, interest in property,
 participation right, contract right, practice, technique, or
 technology that:
 (A)  facilitates the recycling and reuse of water,
 wastewater effluent, or other water or wastewater by-product; and
 (B)  results in additional water supplies for
 future or alternative uses.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 7808, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER B.  REUSE PROJECT POWERS AND DUTIES
 Sec. 7808.151.  ACQUISITION OF REUSE PROJECT. The district
 may acquire a reuse project, including by purchase or lease.
 Sec. 7808.152.  CONSTRUCTION, MAINTENANCE, AND OPERATION OF
 REUSE PROJECT. The district may construct, rehabilitate, repair,
 improve, enlarge, operate, and maintain a reuse project.
 [Sec.   7808.153.     DELIVERY METHOD. The district may use
 alternative delivery methods under Chapter 2267, Government Code,
 as added by Chapter 1129 (H.B. 628), Acts of the 82nd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2011, for a project, in addition to any method
 provided by Chapters 49 and 57, Water Code.]
 Sec. 7808.154.  CONVEYANCE OF REUSE PROJECT. If the board
 considers the terms appropriate and favorable to the district, the
 district may convey a reuse project to a:
 (1)  municipality in whose extraterritorial
 jurisdiction all or part of the district is located; or
 (2)  political subdivision located wholly or partly in
 the district.
 Sec. 7808.155.  USE OF REUSE PROJECT WATER. If the board
 considers the terms appropriate and favorable to the district, the
 district may:
 (1)  use the water from a reuse project; or
 (2)  sell or otherwise provide the water to:
 (A)  a homeowners' or property owners' association
 located in the district; or
 (B)  with the prior consent of a municipality
 described by Section 7808.154(1), any person located in the
 extraterritorial jurisdiction of that municipality, including a
 political subdivision, private entity, and individual.
 Sec. 7808.156.  REUSE PROJECT FINANCING. The district may
 finance a reuse project with property taxes, mandatory fees, or
 voluntary contributions.
 Sec. 7808.157.  REUSE PROJECT BONDS. The district may issue
 bonds or other obligations for a reuse project in the manner
 provided by Subchapter G, Chapter 57, Water Code.
 Sec. 7808.158.  JOINT REUSE PROJECT. The district may act
 jointly in regard to a reuse project under an agreement or contract
 with any person, including a political subdivision, private entity,
 or individual.
 Sec. 7808.159.  MUNICIPAL APPROVAL. (a) The plans and
 specifications for the construction or modification of a reuse
 project are subject to:
 (1)  the review and approval of any municipality in
 whose extraterritorial jurisdiction all or part of the district is
 located; and
 (2)  any ordinance, regulation, or standard criteria a
 municipality described by Subdivision (1) may adopt relating to the
 construction or operation of similar reuse projects in its
 corporate limits or extraterritorial jurisdiction.
 (b)  The approval required by Subsection (a) must be in the
 form of an ordinance or resolution adopted by the governing body of
 the municipality. Approval for subsequent modifications,
 extensions, or repairs of a reuse project may be given in the manner
 the municipality customarily uses for other water supply
 improvements in its corporate limits or extraterritorial
 jurisdiction.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 7808, Special District Local Laws Code,
 is amended by adding Subchapter C to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER C.  CONTRACTS
 Sec. 7808.201.  DELIVERY METHOD. Notwithstanding the
 limitations provided by Sections 2269.003 and 2269.352, Government
 Code, for the design and construction of erosion control facilities
 located in or adjacent to the Brazos River and any related facility
 or improvement, the district may use a delivery method described
 by:
 (1)  Chapter 2269, Government Code; or
 (2)  Subchapter I, Chapter 49, Water Code.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4712 was passed by the House on May 3,
 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 132, Nays 8, 2 present, not
 voting;
 that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No.
 4712 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 107, Nays 31, 2
 present, not voting; and that the House adopted H.C.R. No. 187
 authorizing certain corrections in H.B. No. 4712 on May 25, 2019, by
 the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4712 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays
 1; and that the Senate adopted H.C.R. No. 187 authorizing certain
 corrections in H.B. No. 4712 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:
 Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor