4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to the powers and duties of the Fort Bend County Levee |
---|
6 | 12 | | Improvement District No. 7. |
---|
7 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Section 7808.001(3), Special District Local Laws |
---|
9 | 15 | | Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 16 | | (3) "Reuse project [Project]" means a facility, |
---|
11 | 17 | | improvement, appliance, appurtenance, land, interest in property, |
---|
12 | 18 | | participation right, contract right, practice, technique, or |
---|
13 | 19 | | technology that: |
---|
14 | 20 | | (A) facilitates the recycling and reuse of water, |
---|
15 | 21 | | wastewater effluent, or other water or wastewater by-product; and |
---|
16 | 22 | | (B) results in additional water supplies for |
---|
17 | 23 | | future or alternative uses. |
---|
18 | 24 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 7808, Special District |
---|
19 | 25 | | Local Laws Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
20 | 26 | | SUBCHAPTER B. REUSE PROJECT POWERS AND DUTIES |
---|
21 | 27 | | Sec. 7808.151. ACQUISITION OF REUSE PROJECT. The district |
---|
22 | 28 | | may acquire a reuse project, including by purchase or lease. |
---|
23 | 29 | | Sec. 7808.152. CONSTRUCTION, MAINTENANCE, AND OPERATION OF |
---|
24 | 30 | | REUSE PROJECT. The district may construct, rehabilitate, repair, |
---|
25 | 31 | | improve, enlarge, operate, and maintain a reuse project. |
---|
26 | 32 | | [Sec. 7808.153. DELIVERY METHOD. The district may use |
---|
27 | 33 | | alternative delivery methods under Chapter 2267, Government Code, |
---|
28 | 34 | | as added by Chapter 1129 (H.B. 628), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, |
---|
29 | 35 | | Regular Session, 2011, for a project, in addition to any method |
---|
30 | 36 | | provided by Chapters 49 and 57, Water Code.] |
---|
31 | 37 | | Sec. 7808.154. CONVEYANCE OF REUSE PROJECT. If the board |
---|
32 | 38 | | considers the terms appropriate and favorable to the district, the |
---|
33 | 39 | | district may convey a reuse project to a: |
---|
34 | 40 | | (1) municipality in whose extraterritorial |
---|
35 | 41 | | jurisdiction all or part of the district is located; or |
---|
36 | 42 | | (2) political subdivision located wholly or partly in |
---|
37 | 43 | | the district. |
---|
38 | 44 | | Sec. 7808.155. USE OF REUSE PROJECT WATER. If the board |
---|
39 | 45 | | considers the terms appropriate and favorable to the district, the |
---|
40 | 46 | | district may: |
---|
41 | 47 | | (1) use the water from a reuse project; or |
---|
42 | 48 | | (2) sell or otherwise provide the water to: |
---|
43 | 49 | | (A) a homeowners' or property owners' association |
---|
44 | 50 | | located in the district; or |
---|
45 | 51 | | (B) with the prior consent of a municipality |
---|
46 | 52 | | described by Section 7808.154(1), any person located in the |
---|
47 | 53 | | extraterritorial jurisdiction of that municipality, including a |
---|
48 | 54 | | political subdivision, private entity, and individual. |
---|
49 | 55 | | Sec. 7808.156. REUSE PROJECT FINANCING. The district may |
---|
50 | 56 | | finance a reuse project with property taxes, mandatory fees, or |
---|
51 | 57 | | voluntary contributions. |
---|
52 | 58 | | Sec. 7808.157. REUSE PROJECT BONDS. The district may issue |
---|
53 | 59 | | bonds or other obligations for a reuse project in the manner |
---|
54 | 60 | | provided by Subchapter G, Chapter 57, Water Code. |
---|
55 | 61 | | Sec. 7808.158. JOINT REUSE PROJECT. The district may act |
---|
56 | 62 | | jointly in regard to a reuse project under an agreement or contract |
---|
57 | 63 | | with any person, including a political subdivision, private entity, |
---|
58 | 64 | | or individual. |
---|
59 | 65 | | Sec. 7808.159. MUNICIPAL APPROVAL. (a) The plans and |
---|
60 | 66 | | specifications for the construction or modification of a reuse |
---|
61 | 67 | | project are subject to: |
---|
62 | 68 | | (1) the review and approval of any municipality in |
---|
63 | 69 | | whose extraterritorial jurisdiction all or part of the district is |
---|
64 | 70 | | located; and |
---|
65 | 71 | | (2) any ordinance, regulation, or standard criteria a |
---|
66 | 72 | | municipality described by Subdivision (1) may adopt relating to the |
---|
67 | 73 | | construction or operation of similar reuse projects in its |
---|
68 | 74 | | corporate limits or extraterritorial jurisdiction. |
---|
69 | 75 | | (b) The approval required by Subsection (a) must be in the |
---|
70 | 76 | | form of an ordinance or resolution adopted by the governing body of |
---|
71 | 77 | | the municipality. Approval for subsequent modifications, |
---|
72 | 78 | | extensions, or repairs of a reuse project may be given in the manner |
---|
73 | 79 | | the municipality customarily uses for other water supply |
---|
74 | 80 | | improvements in its corporate limits or extraterritorial |
---|
75 | 81 | | jurisdiction. |
---|
76 | 82 | | SECTION 3. Chapter 7808, Special District Local Laws Code, |
---|
77 | 83 | | is amended by adding Subchapter C to read as follows: |
---|
78 | 84 | | SUBCHAPTER C. CONTRACTS |
---|
79 | 85 | | Sec. 7808.201. DELIVERY METHOD. Notwithstanding the |
---|
80 | 86 | | limitations provided by Sections 2269.003 and 2269.352, Government |
---|
81 | 87 | | Code, for the design and construction of erosion control facilities |
---|
82 | 88 | | located in or adjacent to the Brazos River and any related facility |
---|
83 | 89 | | or improvement, the district may use a delivery method described |
---|
84 | 90 | | by: |
---|
85 | 91 | | (1) Chapter 2269, Government Code; or |
---|
86 | 92 | | (2) Subchapter I, Chapter 49, Water Code. |
---|
87 | 93 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
88 | 94 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
89 | 95 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
90 | 96 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
91 | 97 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
92 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
93 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
94 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4712 was passed by the House on May 3, |
---|
95 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 132, Nays 8, 2 present, not |
---|
96 | | - | voting; |
---|
97 | | - | that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. |
---|
98 | | - | 4712 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 107, Nays 31, 2 |
---|
99 | | - | present, not voting; and that the House adopted H.C.R. No. 187 |
---|
100 | | - | authorizing certain corrections in H.B. No. 4712 on May 25, 2019, by |
---|
101 | | - | the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. |
---|
102 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
103 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
104 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4712 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
105 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
106 | | - | 1; and that the Senate adopted H.C.R. No. 187 authorizing certain |
---|
107 | | - | corrections in H.B. No. 4712 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: |
---|
108 | | - | Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
109 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
110 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
111 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
112 | | - | Date |
---|
113 | | - | __________________ |
---|
114 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 98 | + | * * * * * |
---|