Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4749 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 18, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 10, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2019
Bill May 4, 2019