Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4752 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 4752
1+By: Dutton (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 4752
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2019;
3+ May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Intergovernmental Relations; May 20, 2019, reported adversely,
5+ with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7,
6+ Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4752 By: Menéndez
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the territory of the Barrett Management District.
614 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
715 SECTION 1. Section 3930.005, Special District Local Laws
816 Code, is amended to read as follows:
917 Sec. 3930.005. DISTRICT TERRITORY. (a) The district is
1018 composed of the territory described by Section 2 of the Act enacting
1119 this chapter, as that territory may have been modified under this
1220 section, Section 3930.107, or other law.
1321 (b) The boundaries and field notes of the district contained
1422 in Section 2 of the Act enacting this chapter form a closure. A
1523 mistake in the field notes of the district contained in Section 2 of
1624 the Act enacting this chapter or in copying the field notes in the
1725 legislative process does not in any way affect the district's:
1826 (1) organization, existence, or validity; or
1927 (2) legality or operation.
2028 (c) The district shall hold an election in the additional
2129 territory in the new boundaries of the district described by
2230 Section 2 of the Act enacting this subsection on a uniform election
2331 date provided by Section 41.001, Election Code, to confirm the
2432 addition of the territory to the district.
2533 (d) Notice of the confirmation election shall state the day
2634 and place or places for holding the election and the proposition to
2735 be voted on.
2836 (e) The ballots for the confirmation election shall be
2937 printed to provide for voting "For New District Boundaries" and
3038 "Against New District Boundaries."
3139 (f) Immediately after the confirmation election, the
3240 presiding judge shall take returns of the results to the board. The
3341 board shall canvass the returns and issue an order declaring the
3442 results at the earliest practicable time. The order must include a
3543 description of the district's boundaries according to the results
3644 of the election.
3745 (g) If at least 60 percent of the votes cast in the election
3846 favor the addition of the territory to the district, the board shall
3947 issue an order declaring that the additional territory is added to
4048 the district and enter the result in its minutes. If less than 60
4149 percent of the votes cast in the election favor the addition of the
4250 territory to the district, the board shall issue an order declaring
4351 that the addition was defeated and enter the result in its minutes.
4452 (h) A copy of each order issued under this section must be
4553 filed:
4654 (1) in the deed records of Harris County; and
4755 (2) with the Texas Commission on Environmental
4856 Quality.
4957 (i) Notwithstanding Subsections (a) and (b) of this
5058 section, if at least 60 percent of the votes cast in the election
5159 favor the addition of the territory in the new boundaries described
5260 by Section 2 of the Act enacting this subsection to the district,
5361 the district is composed of the territory in those new boundaries,
5462 as that territory may have been modified under Section 3930.107 or
5563 other law. The boundaries of the district contained in Section 2 of
5664 the Act enacting this subsection form a closure. A mistake in the
5765 description of the district contained in Section 2 of the Act
5866 enacting this subsection or in copying the description in the
5967 legislative process does not in any way affect the district's:
6068 (1) organization, existence, or validity; or
6169 (2) legality or operation.
6270 (j) If less than 60 percent of the votes cast in the election
6371 favor the addition of the territory in the new boundaries described
6472 by Section 2 of the Act enacting this subsection to the district:
6573 (1) Subsections (a) and (b) apply to the territory of
6674 the district; and
6775 (2) the new boundaries described by Section 2 of the
6876 Act enacting this subsection are void.
6977 SECTION 2. The Barrett Management District includes all the
7078 territory contained in the area enclosed by:
7179 (1) Sralla Road from Kennings Road to Barbers Hill
7280 Road;
7381 (2) Barbers Hill Road from Sralla Road to Crosby
7482 Lynchburg Road;
7583 (3) Crosby Lynchburg Road from Barbers Hill Road to
7684 Floyd Road;
7785 (4) Floyd Road from Crosby Lynchburg Road to the San
7886 Jacinto River;
7987 (5) the San Jacinto River from Floyd Road to Beaumont
8088 Highway;
8189 (6) Beaumont Highway from the San Jacinto River to
8290 Crosby Lynchburg Road;
8391 (7) Crosby Lynchburg Road from Beaumont Highway to the
8492 northbound U.S. Highway 90 Frontage Road;
8593 (8) the northbound U.S. Highway 90 Frontage Road from
8694 Crosby Lynchburg Road to Kennings Road; and
8795 (9) Kennings Road from the northbound U.S. Highway 90
8896 Frontage Road to Sralla Road.
8997 SECTION 3. (a) The legal notice of the intention to
9098 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
9199 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
92100 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
93101 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
94102 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
95103 Government Code.
96104 (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has
97105 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
98106 Environmental Quality.
99107 (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
100108 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor,
101109 lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of representatives
102110 within the required time.
103111 (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
104112 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
105113 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act have been
106114 fulfilled and accomplished.
107115 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
108116 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
109117 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
110118 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
111119 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
112- ______________________________ ______________________________
113- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
114- I certify that H.B. No. 4752 was passed by the House on May 7,
115- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 7, 2 present, not
116- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
117- No. 4752 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 95, Nays 44,
118- 3 present, not voting.
119- ______________________________
120- Chief Clerk of the House
121- I certify that H.B. No. 4752 was passed by the Senate, with
122- amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
123- 1.
124- ______________________________
125- Secretary of the Senate
126- APPROVED: __________________
127- Date
128- __________________
129- Governor
120+ * * * * *