By: Lopez, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 4754 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2019; May 14, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to a study on the number of active releasees on a parole officer's caseload. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. (a) In this section, "parole officer" and "releasee" have the meanings assigned by Section 508.001, Government Code. (b) The Texas Department of Criminal Justice shall conduct a study on: (1) the average number of active releasees on a parole officer's caseload; (2) how the department factors the number of active releasees on a parole officer's caseload in determining its legislative appropriations request and budget; and (3) whether the department is accurately assessing the number of active releasees on a parole officer's caseload to ensure that: (A) the department receives an adequate amount of funding to employ a sufficient number of parole officers; and (B) a parole officer is not overburdened or overworked based on the number of active releasees on the parole officer's caseload. (c) Not later than September 1, 2020, the Texas Department of Criminal Justice shall prepare and submit to the legislature a written report that summarizes the results of the study conducted under this section. SECTION 2. This Act expires December 31, 2020. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *