1 | | - | H.B. No. 4754 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Lopez, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 4754 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 14, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal |
---|
| 4 | + | Justice; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
| 5 | + | Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to a study on the number of active releasees on a parole |
---|
6 | 12 | | officer's caseload. |
---|
7 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 14 | | SECTION 1. (a) In this section, "parole officer" and |
---|
9 | 15 | | "releasee" have the meanings assigned by Section 508.001, |
---|
10 | 16 | | Government Code. |
---|
11 | 17 | | (b) The Texas Department of Criminal Justice shall conduct a |
---|
12 | 18 | | study on: |
---|
13 | 19 | | (1) the average number of active releasees on a parole |
---|
14 | 20 | | officer's caseload; |
---|
15 | 21 | | (2) how the department factors the number of active |
---|
16 | 22 | | releasees on a parole officer's caseload in determining its |
---|
17 | 23 | | legislative appropriations request and budget; and |
---|
18 | 24 | | (3) whether the department is accurately assessing the |
---|
19 | 25 | | number of active releasees on a parole officer's caseload to ensure |
---|
20 | 26 | | that: |
---|
21 | 27 | | (A) the department receives an adequate amount of |
---|
22 | 28 | | funding to employ a sufficient number of parole officers; and |
---|
23 | 29 | | (B) a parole officer is not overburdened or |
---|
24 | 30 | | overworked based on the number of active releasees on the parole |
---|
25 | 31 | | officer's caseload. |
---|
26 | 32 | | (c) Not later than September 1, 2020, the Texas Department |
---|
27 | 33 | | of Criminal Justice shall prepare and submit to the legislature a |
---|
28 | 34 | | written report that summarizes the results of the study conducted |
---|
29 | 35 | | under this section. |
---|
30 | 36 | | SECTION 2. This Act expires December 31, 2020. |
---|
31 | 37 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
32 | 38 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
33 | 39 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
34 | 40 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
35 | 41 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
36 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
37 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
38 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4754 was passed by the House on May |
---|
39 | | - | 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 133, Nays 8, 2 present, not |
---|
40 | | - | voting. |
---|
41 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
42 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
43 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4754 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
44 | | - | 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
45 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
46 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
47 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
48 | | - | Date |
---|
49 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
50 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 42 | + | * * * * * |
---|