House | 05/24/2019 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Posting rule suspended | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Referred to County Affairs | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Filed |