|
06/07/2019
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
|
06/07/2019
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
|
|
05/25/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2019
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1449
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|