1 | | - | H.B. No. 511 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Wilson, Bucy (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 511 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Transportation; May 9, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 9, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 511 By: Hinojosa |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the enforcement of commercial motor vehicle safety |
---|
6 | 14 | | standards in certain counties. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 644.101(c), Transportation Code, is |
---|
9 | 17 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | (c) A sheriff or a deputy sheriff of any of the following |
---|
11 | 19 | | counties [a county bordering the United Mexican States or of a |
---|
12 | 20 | | county with a population of 700,000 or more] is eligible to apply |
---|
13 | 21 | | for certification under this section: |
---|
14 | 22 | | (1) a county bordering the United Mexican States; |
---|
15 | 23 | | (2) a county with a population of 700,000 or more; or |
---|
16 | 24 | | (3) a county with a population of 400,000 or more that |
---|
17 | 25 | | borders the county in which the State Capitol is located. |
---|
18 | 26 | | SECTION 2. Section 644.102, Transportation Code, is amended |
---|
19 | 27 | | by adding Subsection (h) to read as follows: |
---|
20 | 28 | | (h) The department may revoke or rescind the authority of a |
---|
21 | 29 | | municipality or county to engage in enforcement under this chapter |
---|
22 | 30 | | if the municipality or county fails to comply with this section or |
---|
23 | 31 | | any standard established under Subsection (a). |
---|
24 | 32 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
25 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
26 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
27 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 511 was passed by the House on April |
---|
28 | | - | 18, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 128, Nays 4, 1 present, not |
---|
29 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
30 | | - | No. 511 on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 129, Nays 12, |
---|
31 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
32 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
33 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
34 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 511 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
35 | | - | amendments, on May 15, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
36 | | - | 0. |
---|
37 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
38 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
39 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
40 | | - | Date |
---|
41 | | - | __________________ |
---|
42 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 33 | + | * * * * * |
---|