Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB52 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-86R23635 GRM-D
2- By: Hinojosa, Wray, Martinez Fischer, H.B. No. 52
3- Guillen, Cole
4- Substitute the following for H.B. No. 52:
5- By: Rodriguez C.S.H.B. No. 52
1+86R1540 GRM-D
2+ By: Hinojosa H.B. No. 52
63
74
85 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
96 AN ACT
107 relating to a franchise tax credit pilot program for taxable
118 entities that contribute to an employee dependent care flexible
129 spending account.
1310 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1411 SECTION 1. Chapter 171, Tax Code, is amended by adding
1512 Subchapter P to read as follows:
1613 SUBCHAPTER P. TAX CREDIT PILOT PROGRAM FOR EMPLOYER CONTRIBUTIONS
1714 TO DEPENDENT CARE FLEXIBLE SPENDING ACCOUNTS
1815 Sec. 171.801. DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "dependent
1916 care flexible spending account" means a pretax benefit account used
2017 to pay eligible dependent care services as authorized by the
2118 Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as effective on January 1, 2019.
2219 Sec. 171.802. ENTITLEMENT TO CREDIT. A taxable entity is
2320 entitled to a credit in the amount and under the conditions provided
2421 by this subchapter against the tax imposed under this chapter.
25- Sec. 171.803. QUALIFICATION. (a) Subject to Subsection
26- (b), a taxable entity qualifies for a credit under this subchapter
27- if the taxable entity:
28- (1) has an average of not more than 500 employees
29- during the period on which the report is based; and
30- (2) contributes to the dependent care flexible
22+ Sec. 171.803. QUALIFICATION. A taxable entity with not
23+ more than 500 employees qualifies for a credit under this
24+ subchapter for contributions made to the dependent care flexible
3125 spending account of each employee of the taxable entity who
32- maintains an account and receives from the taxable entity an annual
33- salary or wage of not more than $65,000.
34- (b) A combined group qualifies for a credit under this
35- subchapter in connection with any member of the combined group that
36- satisfies the requirements of Subsection (a).
26+ receives from the taxable entity an annual salary or wage of not
27+ more than $65,000.
3728 Sec. 171.804. AMOUNT OF CREDIT; LIMITATIONS. (a) Subject
3829 to Subsection (b), the amount of the credit for a report in
39- connection with each employee described by Section 171.803(a)(2) is
40- equal to the lesser of:
30+ connection with each employee described by Section 171.803 is equal
31+ to the lesser of:
4132 (1) 50 percent of the contributions made by the
4233 taxable entity to the employee's dependent care flexible spending
43- account, excluding any portion of a contribution returned to the
44- taxable entity; or
34+ account; or
4535 (2) $2,500.
4636 (b) The total amount of the credit for each report is equal
4737 to the lesser of:
4838 (1) the total of the credits allowed under Subsection
4939 (a) for the reporting period for all employees; or
5040 (2) the amount of franchise tax due after applying all
5141 other applicable credits.
5242 Sec. 171.805. APPLICATION FOR CREDIT. (a) A taxable entity
5343 must apply for a credit under this subchapter on or with the tax
5444 report for the period for which the credit is claimed.
5545 (b) The comptroller shall promulgate a form for the
5646 application for the credit. A taxable entity must use the form in
5747 applying for the credit.
5848 Sec. 171.806. PERIOD FOR WHICH CREDIT MAY BE CLAIMED. A
5949 taxable entity may claim a credit under this subchapter for a report
6050 only in connection with contributions made during the accounting
6151 period on which the report is based.
62- Sec. 171.807. DEPOSIT OF CERTAIN REVENUE. Notwithstanding
63- any other law, for each fiscal year, the comptroller must deposit to
64- the credit of the property tax relief fund an amount of revenue
65- received from the tax imposed under this chapter sufficient to
66- offset any decrease in deposits to that fund that results from the
67- implementation of this subchapter.
68- Sec. 171.808. EXPIRATION. This subchapter expires December
52+ Sec. 171.807. EXPIRATION. This subchapter expires December
6953 31, 2021.
7054 SECTION 2. (a) Not later than September 1, 2022, the
7155 comptroller shall prepare and deliver to the governor, the
7256 lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives,
7357 and the presiding officer of each legislative standing committee
7458 with primary jurisdiction over taxation a report that evaluates the
7559 effect of the pilot program established under Subchapter P, Chapter
7660 171, Tax Code, as added by this Act, on employer contributions to
7761 employees' dependent care flexible spending accounts for which
7862 credits are granted under the pilot program under that subchapter.
7963 The report must include a recommendation regarding whether the
8064 credit allowed under the pilot program should be reestablished.
8165 (b) A taxable entity that claims a credit under Subchapter
8266 P, Chapter 171, Tax Code, as added by this Act, shall provide to the
8367 comptroller information the comptroller requests to prepare the
8468 report described by Subsection (a) of this section.
8569 SECTION 3. A taxable entity may claim the credit under
8670 Subchapter P, Chapter 171, Tax Code, as added by this Act, only for
87- contributions made on or after September 1, 2019, and before
88- January 1, 2022, and only on a franchise tax report originally due
89- under Chapter 171, Tax Code, on or after January 1, 2020, and before
90- January 1, 2023, notwithstanding the expiration of Subchapter P,
91- Chapter 171, Tax Code, as added by this Act.
71+ contributions made on or after September 1, 2019, and only on a
72+ franchise tax report originally due under Chapter 171, Tax Code, on
73+ or after January 1, 2020.
9274 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.