House | 05/09/2019 | Postponed 1/10/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/20/2019 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | ||
House | 02/20/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 12/18/2018 | Filed |