Senate | 05/07/2019 | Referred to Education | ||
Senate | 05/07/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/04/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Record vote RV#1015 | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Passed | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Amendment withdrawn 1-Ramos | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2 | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Amendment(s) offered 1-Ramos | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/01/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/20/2019 | Referred to Public Education | ||
House | 12/18/2018 | Filed |