Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB598 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/29/2019

                    By: Price, Moody (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 598
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
 April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; April 29, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 29, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of funds appropriated for the continuing legal
 education of certain appointed masters, magistrates, referees, and
 associate judges.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 56.003(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  No more than one-third of the funds appropriated for any
 fiscal year shall be used for the continuing legal education of
 judges of appellate courts, district courts, county courts at law,
 county courts performing judicial functions, full-time associate
 judges and masters appointed pursuant to Chapter 201, Family Code,
 and full-time and part-time masters, magistrates, referees, and
 associate judges appointed pursuant to Chapter 54 or 54A as
 required by the court of criminal appeals under Section 74.025 and
 of their court personnel.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *