1 | | - | H.B. No. 598 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Price, Moody (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 598 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
| 4 | + | Affairs; April 29, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
| 5 | + | Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 29, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to the use of funds appropriated for the continuing legal |
---|
6 | 12 | | education of certain appointed masters, magistrates, referees, and |
---|
7 | 13 | | associate judges. |
---|
8 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Section 56.003(b), Government Code, is amended |
---|
10 | 16 | | to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 17 | | (b) No more than one-third of the funds appropriated for any |
---|
12 | 18 | | fiscal year shall be used for the continuing legal education of |
---|
13 | 19 | | judges of appellate courts, district courts, county courts at law, |
---|
14 | 20 | | county courts performing judicial functions, full-time associate |
---|
15 | 21 | | judges and masters appointed pursuant to Chapter 201, Family Code, |
---|
16 | 22 | | and full-time and part-time masters, magistrates, referees, and |
---|
17 | 23 | | associate judges appointed pursuant to Chapter 54 or 54A as |
---|
18 | 24 | | required by the court of criminal appeals under Section 74.025 and |
---|
19 | 25 | | of their court personnel. |
---|
20 | 26 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
21 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
22 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
23 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 598 was passed by the House on |
---|
24 | | - | April 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 |
---|
25 | | - | present, not voting. |
---|
26 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
27 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
28 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 598 was passed by the Senate on |
---|
29 | | - | May |
---|
30 | | - | 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
31 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
32 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
33 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
34 | | - | Date |
---|
35 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
36 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 27 | + | * * * * * |
---|