Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB6 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 6
1+By: Morrison, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 6
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
3+ April 16, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Water &
4+ Rural Affairs; May 15, 2019, reported favorably by the following
5+ vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
5- relating to disaster relief and recovery.
11+ relating to developing a disaster recovery task force to assist
12+ with long-term disaster recovery.
613 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
7- SECTION 1. Sections 418.005(a), (b), (c), and (e),
8- Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
9- (a) This section applies only to:
10- (1) an elected law enforcement officer or county
11- judge, or an appointed public officer of the state or of a political
12- subdivision, who has management or supervisory responsibilities
13- and:
14- (A) [(1)] whose position description, job
15- duties, or assignment includes emergency management
16- responsibilities; or
17- (B) [(2)] who plays a role in emergency
18- preparedness, response, or recovery; and
19- (2) an emergency management coordinator designated
20- under Section 418.1015(c) by the emergency management director of a
21- county with a population of 500,000 or more.
22- (b) Each person described by Subsection (a) shall complete a
23- course of training provided or approved by the division of not less
24- than three hours regarding the responsibilities of state and local
25- governments under this chapter not later than the 180th day after
26- the date the person:
27- (1) takes the oath of office, if the person is required
28- to take an oath of office to assume the person's duties as a public
29- officer; [or]
30- (2) otherwise assumes responsibilities as a public
31- officer, if the person is not required to take an oath of office to
32- assume the person's duties; or
33- (3) is designated as an emergency management
34- coordinator under Section 418.1015(c).
35- (c) The division shall develop and provide a training course
36- related to the emergency management responsibilities of
37- state-level officers and a training course related to the emergency
38- management responsibilities of officers and emergency management
39- coordinators of political subdivisions. The division shall ensure
40- that the training courses satisfy the requirements of Subsection
41- (b).
42- (e) The division or other entity providing the training
43- shall provide a certificate of course completion to a person
44- [public officers] who completes [complete] the training required by
45- this section. A person [public officer] who completes the training
46- required by this section shall maintain and make available for
47- public inspection the record of the person's [public officer's]
48- completion of the training.
49- SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 418, Government Code, is
14+ SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 418, Government Code, is
5015 amended by adding Section 418.054 to read as follows:
5116 Sec. 418.054. DISASTER RECOVERY TASK FORCE. (a) The
5217 division shall develop a disaster recovery task force to operate
5318 throughout the long-term recovery period following natural and
5419 man-made disasters by providing specialized assistance for
5520 communities and individuals to address financial issues, available
5621 federal assistance programs, and recovery and resiliency planning
5722 to speed recovery efforts at the local level.
5823 (b) The disaster recovery task force may include and use the
5924 resources of:
6025 (1) any appropriate state agencies, including
6126 institutions of higher education; and
6227 (2) organized volunteer groups.
6328 (c) The disaster recovery task force shall develop
6429 procedures for preparing and issuing a report listing each project
6530 related to a disaster that qualifies for federal assistance. A
6631 report must be submitted to the appropriate federal agencies as
6732 soon as practicable after any disaster.
6833 (d) Once each quarter, the disaster recovery task force
6934 shall brief members of the legislature, legislative staff, and
7035 state agency personnel on the response and recovery efforts for
7136 previous disasters and any preparation or planning for potential
7237 future hazards, threats, or disasters.
73- SECTION 3. Section 418.102, Government Code, is amended by
74- adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
75- (a-1) An emergency management program required by
76- Subsection (a) and maintained by a county, or in which a county
77- participates, must provide for catastrophic debris management.
78- SECTION 4. Section 33.604, Natural Resources Code, is
79- amended by adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
80- (b-1) In addition to the money described by Subsection (b),
81- the account consists of money transferred to the account under
82- Section 156.252, Tax Code. This subsection expires September 1,
83- 2031.
84- SECTION 5. Subchapter F, Chapter 156, Tax Code, is amended
85- by adding Section 156.252 to read as follows:
86- Sec. 156.252. TEMPORARY ALLOCATION OF CERTAIN REVENUE TO
87- BENEFIT COASTAL COUNTIES. (a) In this section, "coastal county"
88- means any county adjacent to:
89- (1) the Gulf of Mexico; or
90- (2) Corpus Christi Bay.
91- (b) Beginning with the state fiscal year beginning
92- September 1, 2021, and except as provided by Subsection (d), the
93- comptroller shall, not later than September 30 of each state fiscal
94- year:
95- (1) compute the amount of revenue derived from the
96- collection of taxes imposed under this chapter at a rate of two
97- percent and received from hotels located in coastal counties during
98- the preceding state fiscal year; and
99- (2) transfer that amount to the coastal erosion
100- response account created under Section 33.604, Natural Resources
101- Code.
102- (c) Revenue transferred under this section may be
103- appropriated only to the General Land Office for a purpose
104- consistent with Subchapter H, Chapter 33, Natural Resources Code,
105- that benefits a coastal county.
106- (d) Revenue derived from the collection of taxes under this
107- chapter that is placed in a suspense account under Section
108- 151.429(h) or under Section 2303.5055(f), Government Code, is
109- excluded from the computation required by Subsection (b)(1).
110- (e) This section expires September 1, 2031.
111- SECTION 6. Not later than March 1, 2020, each person who is
112- required to complete a course of training under Section 418.005,
113- Government Code, as amended by this Act, must complete the
114- training.
115- SECTION 7. Not later than January 1, 2020, each county shall
116- provide for catastrophic debris management in the county's
117- emergency management program or in a program in which the county
118- participates as required by Section 418.102(a-1), Government Code,
119- as added by this Act.
120- SECTION 8. The Texas Division of Emergency Management is
121- required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
122- legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If
123- the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
124- purpose, the division
125- may, but is not required to, implement a
126- provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
127- purpose.
128- SECTION 9. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
129- ______________________________ ______________________________
130- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
131- I certify that H.B. No. 6 was passed by the House on April 11,
132- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, 1 present, not
133- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
134- No. 6 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 1, 2
135- present, not voting.
136- ______________________________
137- Chief Clerk of the House
138- I certify that H.B. No. 6 was passed by the Senate, with
139- amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
140- 0.
141- ______________________________
142- Secretary of the Senate
143- APPROVED: __________________
144- Date
145- __________________
146- Governor
38+ SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
39+ * * * * *