Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB601 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 28, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2019
Bill March 29, 2019