Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB678 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/14/2019

                    By: Guillen, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Powell) H.B. No. 678
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 3, 2019;
 April 4, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 14, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 14, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the public high school graduation credit requirements
 for a language other than English.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.025(b-21), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b-21)  In adopting rules under Subsection (b-1), the State
 Board of Education shall adopt criteria to allow a student to comply
 with the curriculum requirement for one credit under Subsection
 (b-1)(5) by successfully completing at an elementary school either
 a dual language immersion program under Section 28.0051 or a course
 in American Sign Language [at an elementary school].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *