Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB680 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 8, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2019
Bill April 2, 2019