Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB687 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2019

                    By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 687
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019;
 May 14, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a landowner's liability for injuries incurred during
 certain recreational activities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 75.001(3), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (3)  "Recreation" means an activity such as:
 (A)  hunting;
 (B)  fishing;
 (C)  swimming;
 (D)  boating;
 (E)  camping;
 (F)  picnicking;
 (G)  hiking;
 (H)  pleasure driving, including off-road
 motorcycling and off-road automobile driving and the use of
 all-terrain vehicles and recreational off-highway vehicles;
 (I)  nature study, including bird-watching;
 (J)  cave exploration;
 (K)  waterskiing and other water sports;
 (L)  any other activity associated with enjoying
 nature or the outdoors;
 (M)  bicycling and mountain biking;
 (N)  disc golf;
 (O)  on-leash and off-leash walking of dogs; [or]
 (P)  radio control flying and related activities;
 or
 (Q)  rock climbing.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a cause of action that accrues on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A cause of action that accrued before the effective date
 of this Act is governed by the law applicable to the cause of action
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *