Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB706 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2019
Bill April 18, 2019